Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4034 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4034
1+By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 4034
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
3+ May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4034 By: Huffman
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to certain voter registration information.
614 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
715 SECTION 1. Section 13.004(c-1), Election Code, is amended
816 to read as follows:
917 (c-1) The registrar shall ensure that the information
1018 listed in Subsection (c) is excluded from disclosure, except that
1119 the registrar shall forward to the county chair of each county
1220 executive committee the information necessary to contact
1321 applicants who indicate interest in working as an election judge.
1422 SECTION 2. Section 16.031(a), Election Code, is amended to
1523 read as follows:
1624 (a) The registrar shall cancel a voter's registration
1725 immediately on receipt of:
1826 (1) notice under Section 13.072(b) or 15.021 or a
1927 response under Section 15.053 that the voter's residence is outside
2028 the county;
2129 (2) an abstract of the voter's death certificate under
2230 Section 16.001(a) or an abstract of an application indicating that
2331 the voter is deceased under Section 16.001(b);
2432 (3) an abstract of a final judgment of the voter's
2533 total mental incapacity, partial mental incapacity without the
2634 right to vote, conviction of a felony, or disqualification under
2735 Section 16.002, 16.003, or 16.004;
2836 (4) notice under Section 112.012 that the voter has
2937 applied for a limited ballot in another county;
3038 (5) notice from a voter registration official in
3139 another state that the voter has registered to vote outside this
3240 state;
3341 (6) notice from the early voting clerk under Section
3442 101.053 [101.0041] that a federal postcard application submitted by
3543 an applicant states a voting residence address located outside the
3644 registrar's county; or
3745 (7) notice from the secretary of state that the voter
3846 has registered to vote in another county, as determined by the
3947 voter's driver's license number or personal identification card
4048 number issued by the Department of Public Safety or social security
4149 number.
4250 SECTION 3. Section 18.061(c), Election Code, is amended to
4351 read as follows:
4452 (c) Under procedures prescribed by the secretary of state,
4553 each voter registrar shall provide to the secretary of state on an
4654 expedited basis the information necessary to maintain the
4755 registration list established under Subsection (a). The procedures
4856 shall provide for the electronic submission of the information and
4957 ensure that each voter registrar collects and reports the correct
5058 month, day, and year of birth for each registered voter.
5159 SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 18, Election Code, is
5260 amended by adding Section 18.0681 to read as follows:
5361 Sec. 18.0681. SECRETARY OF STATE AUTHORITY TO ELIMINATE
5462 DUPLICATE REGISTRATION RECORDS. (a) The secretary of state shall
5563 periodically compare the information regarding voters maintained
5664 as part of the statewide computerized voter registration list to
5765 determine whether any voters have more than one voter registration
5866 record on file.
5967 (b) The secretary of state shall by rule determine what
6068 information combinations identified as common to more than one
6169 registration record constitute a weak match or a strong match in
6270 order to:
6371 (1) produce the least possible impact on Texas voters;
6472 and
6573 (2) fulfill its responsibility to manage the voter
6674 rolls.
6775 (c) The secretary of state may not determine that a voter
6876 has more than one registration record based on a weak match. The
6977 secretary of state may inform the county of the voter's residence
7078 that a weak match exists.
7179 (d) If the secretary of state determines that a voter on the
7280 registration list has more than one registration record on file
7381 based on a strong match, the secretary shall send notice of the
7482 determination to the voter registrar of each county in which the
7583 voter is registered to vote. If the voter records identified are:
7684 (1) located in the same county, the voter registrar
7785 may merge the records following a determination that each record
7886 belongs to the same voter using the procedure for the correction of
7987 registration records under Section 15.022; or
8088 (2) located in more than one county, the registrar of
8189 the county with the oldest record may deliver a written
8290 confirmation notice in accordance with Section 15.051.
8391 SECTION 5. Section 19.002(d), Election Code, is amended to
8492 read as follows:
8593 (d) The secretary of state may not make a payment under
8694 Subsection (b) if on June 1 of the year in which the payment is to be
8795 made the registrar is not in substantial compliance with Section
8896 15.083, 16.031, 16.032, or 18.065 or with rules implementing the
8997 registration service program.
9098 SECTION 6. Subchapter A, Chapter 84, Election Code, is
9199 amended by adding Section 84.014 to read as follows:
92100 Sec. 84.014. ACTION BY EARLY VOTING CLERK ON CERTAIN
93101 APPLICATIONS. If an applicant provides a date of birth, driver's
94102 license number, or social security number on the applicant's
95103 application for an early voting ballot to be voted by mail that is
96104 different from or in addition to the information maintained by the
97105 voter registrar in accordance with Title 2, the early voting clerk
98106 shall notify the voter registrar. The voter registrar shall update
99107 the voter's record with the information provided by the applicant.
100108 SECTION 7. Section 101.053, Election Code, is amended to
101109 read as follows:
102110 Sec. 101.053. ACTION BY EARLY VOTING CLERK ON CERTAIN
103111 APPLICATIONS. (a) The early voting clerk shall notify the voter
104112 registrar of a federal postcard application submitted by an
105113 applicant that states a voting residence address located outside
106114 the registrar's county.
107115 (b) If an applicant provides a date of birth, driver's
108116 license number, or social security number on the applicant's
109117 federal postcard application that is different from or in addition
110118 to the information maintained by the voter registrar in accordance
111119 with Title 2, the early voting clerk shall notify the voter
112120 registrar. The voter registrar shall update the voter's record
113121 with the information provided by the applicant.
114122 SECTION 8. Section 62.0132(g), Government Code, is amended
115123 to read as follows:
116124 (g) The information contained in a completed questionnaire
117125 may be disclosed to:
118126 (1) a judge assigned to hear a cause of action in which
119127 the respondent to the questionnaire is a potential juror;
120128 (2) court personnel; [and]
121129 (3) a litigant and a litigant's attorney in a cause of
122130 action in which the respondent to the questionnaire is a potential
123131 juror; and
124132 (4) other than information provided that is related to
125133 Section 62.102(8) or (9), the voter registrar of a county in
126134 connection with any matter of voter registration or the
127135 administration of elections.
128136 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
129137 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
130138 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
131139 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
132140 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
133- ______________________________ ______________________________
134- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
135- I certify that H.B. No. 4034 was passed by the House on May 9,
136- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not
137- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
138- No. 4034 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1,
139- 2 present, not voting.
140- ______________________________
141- Chief Clerk of the House
142- I certify that H.B. No. 4034 was passed by the Senate, with
143- amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
144- 0.
145- ______________________________
146- Secretary of the Senate
147- APPROVED: __________________
148- Date
149- __________________
150- Governor
141+ * * * * *