Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4041 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/15/2017

                            By: Coleman H.B. No. 4041


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing family drug courts in counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  FINDINGS. The House Committee on County Affairs
 held several hearings across Texas in 2016 where the Committee
 heard testimony from many CPS stakeholders around Texas. The
 Committee found that substance abuse is a major factor in the
 removal of many children from their homes by CPS. The Committee
 found that substance abuse by a parent was a factor in nearly two
 thirds of removals. To properly address the CPS crisis in Texas the
 Legislature needs to address the root causes of child removals,
 such as substance abuse. The Committee also found that family drug
 courts such as the Parenting in Recovery/Family Drug Treatment
 program in Travis County has contributed successfully in reducing
 the number of children needing to be removed from their homes by
 CPS. Family drug courts are able to do this by working with the
 parents to help treat their substance abuse and improve their
 parenting skills, all while the children remain in the home.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 122, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 122.005 and 122.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 122.005.  FAMILY DRUG COURT STUDY. (a) Not later than
 September 1, 2018, the commissioners court of each county that has
 not established a family drug court program shall study the effect
 the creation of a family drug court would have in the county. The
 sheriff and, as applicable, the county attorney, district attorney,
 or criminal district attorney shall assist in conducting the study.
 Input from the following persons located in the county as
 applicable shall be requested: judges, CPS caseworkers and
 supervisors, attorney ad litems, guardian ad litems, treatment
 providers, child/family therapists, treatment providers, peer
 recovery coach providers, domestic violence advocates, housing
 partners, drug court coordinators, drug court services managers,
 drug court case managers. The study must analyze the effectiveness
 of:
 (1)  creating a court that specializes in cases in
 which a parent or person standing in parental relation suffers from
 drug addiction; and
 (2)  case management used by a family drug court
 program, including the involvement of Department of Family and
 Protective Services caseworkers, court-appointed case managers,
 and court-appointed special advocates, to rehabilitate a parent or
 person standing in parental relation who has had a child removed
 from the parent's or person's care by the department, or under
 investigation to determine if a child should be removed from the
 parent's or person's care by the department.
 (b)  This section expires January 1, 2019.
 Sec. 122.0051.  GRANT FUNDING FOR FAMILY DRUG COURTS. (a)
 The county family drug court fund is a dedicated account in the
 general revenue fund.
 (b)  The county family drug court fund consists of:
 (1)  appropriations of money to the fund by the
 legislature; and
 (2)  gifts, grants, including grants from the federal
 government, and other donations received for the fund.
 (c)  The Health and Human Service Commission may provide
 counties who submit their study conducted under subsection 122.005
 for consideration with funds to set up and administer a family drug
 court in their
 SECTION 3.  The Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules regarding the criteria for awarding grants described
 under subsection 122.0051 by January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.