Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4056 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4056
1+By: Rose (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 4056
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
3+ May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 16, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
6+ May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4056 By: Lucio
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to a list of best practice-based programs and
614 research-based practices in certain areas for implementation in
715 public schools.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 161.325, Health and Safety Code, is
1018 amended by amending Subsections (a), (a-1), (b), and (c) and adding
1119 Subsection (a-3) to read as follows:
1220 (a) The department, in coordination with the Texas
1321 Education Agency and regional education service centers, shall
1422 provide and annually update a list of recommended best
1523 practice-based programs and research-based practices in the areas
1624 specified under Subsection (a-1) for implementation in public
1725 elementary, junior high, middle, and high schools within the
1826 general education setting. Each school district may select from
1927 the list a program or programs appropriate for implementation in
2028 the district.
2129 (a-1) The list must include programs and practices in the
2230 following areas:
2331 (1) early mental health intervention;
2432 (2) building skills related to managing emotions,
2533 establishing and maintaining positive relationships, and
2634 responsible decision-making [mental health promotion and positive
2735 youth development];
2836 (3) substance abuse prevention;
2937 (4) substance abuse intervention; [and]
3038 (5) suicide prevention;
3139 (6) trauma-informed practices;
3240 (7) positive school climates; and
3341 (8) positive behavior supports.
3442 (a-3) For purposes of Subsection (a-1), "school climate"
3543 means the quality and character of school life, including
3644 interpersonal relationships, teaching and learning practices, and
3745 organizational structures, as experienced by students enrolled in
3846 the school district, parents of those students, and personnel
3947 employed by the district.
4048 (b) The suicide prevention programs on the list must include
4149 components that provide for training counselors, teachers, nurses,
4250 administrators, and other staff, as well as law enforcement
4351 officers and social workers who regularly interact with students,
4452 to:
4553 (1) recognize students at risk of committing suicide,
4654 including students who are or may be the victims of or who engage in
4755 bullying;
4856 (2) recognize students displaying early warning signs
4957 and a possible need for early mental health or substance abuse
5058 intervention, which warning signs may include declining academic
5159 performance, depression, anxiety, isolation, unexplained changes
5260 in sleep or eating habits, and destructive behavior toward self and
5361 others; and
5462 (3) intervene effectively with students described by
5563 Subdivision (1) or (2) by providing notice and referral to a parent
5664 or guardian so appropriate action, such as seeking mental health or
5765 substance abuse services, may be taken by a parent or guardian.
5866 (c) In developing the list of best practice-based programs
5967 and research-based practices, the department and the Texas
6068 Education Agency shall consider:
6169 (1) any existing suicide prevention method developed
6270 by a school district; and
6371 (2) any Internet or online course or program developed
6472 in this state or another state that is based on best practices
6573 recognized by the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services
6674 Administration or the Suicide Prevention Resource Center.
6775 SECTION 2. Section 21.044(c-1), Education Code, is amended
6876 to read as follows:
6977 (c-1) Any minimum academic qualifications for a certificate
7078 specified under Subsection (a) that require a person to possess a
7179 bachelor's degree must also require that the person receive, as
7280 part of the training required to obtain that certificate,
7381 instruction regarding mental health, substance abuse, and youth
7482 suicide. The instruction required must:
7583 (1) be provided through a program selected from the
7684 list of recommended best practice-based programs and
7785 research-based practices established under Section 161.325, Health
7886 and Safety Code; and
7987 (2) include effective strategies for teaching and
8088 intervening with students with mental or emotional disorders,
8189 including de-escalation techniques and positive behavioral
8290 interventions and supports.
8391 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8492 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8593 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8694 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8795 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
88- ______________________________ ______________________________
89- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
90- I certify that H.B. No. 4056 was passed by the House on May 4,
91- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not
92- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
93- No. 4056 on May 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 4,
94- 2 present, not voting.
95- ______________________________
96- Chief Clerk of the House
97- I certify that H.B. No. 4056 was passed by the Senate, with
98- amendments, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
99- 0.
100- ______________________________
101- Secretary of the Senate
102- APPROVED: __________________
103- Date
104- __________________
105- Governor
96+ * * * * *