House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Motion to suspend three day rule fails
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|