Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4187 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Raney, Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 4187
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 21, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4187 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of revenue from municipal hotel occupancy taxes
 for a sports facility or field in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.1078, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (a-1) and (c) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The report described by Subsection (a)(2) shall be
 made accessible through a link that appears in a prominent place on
 the municipality's Internet website.
 (c)  At least annually, a municipality to which this section
 applies shall compare the actual area hotel revenue that is
 attributable to sporting events held at the sporting related
 facility or sports field described by Section 351.101(i) to the
 projected annual amount of that revenue anticipated by the
 municipality to be generated as a result of the construction or
 expansion of the facility or field. If area hotel revenue
 attributable to sporting events held at the facility or field is
 less than the projected amount, the municipality shall, as soon as
 practicable, develop and implement a plan to increase that revenue.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *