1 | | - | H.B. No. 4187 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Raney, Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 4187 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 4 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 21, 2017, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 6 | + | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 2; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4187 By: Seliger |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the use of revenue from municipal hotel occupancy taxes |
---|
6 | 14 | | for a sports facility or field in certain municipalities. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 351.1078, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
9 | 17 | | Subsections (a-1) and (c) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a-1) The report described by Subsection (a)(2) shall be |
---|
11 | 19 | | made accessible through a link that appears in a prominent place on |
---|
12 | 20 | | the municipality's Internet website. |
---|
13 | 21 | | (c) At least annually, a municipality to which this section |
---|
14 | | - | applies shall compare the area hotel revenue that is attributable |
---|
15 | | - | to sporting events held at the sporting related facility or sports |
---|
16 | | - | field described by Section 351.101(i) to the projected annual |
---|
17 | | - | amount of that revenue anticipated by the municipality to be |
---|
18 | | - | generated as a result of the construction or expansion of the |
---|
19 | | - | facility or field. If area hotel revenue attributable to sporting |
---|
20 | | - | events held at the facility or field is less than the projected |
---|
21 | | - | amount, the municipality shall, as soon as practicable, develop and |
---|
22 | | - | implement a plan to increase that revenue. |
---|
23 | | - | SECTION 2. This Act takes |
---|
24 | | - | effect immediately if it receives |
---|
| 22 | + | applies shall compare the actual area hotel revenue that is |
---|
| 23 | + | attributable to sporting events held at the sporting related |
---|
| 24 | + | facility or sports field described by Section 351.101(i) to the |
---|
| 25 | + | projected annual amount of that revenue anticipated by the |
---|
| 26 | + | municipality to be generated as a result of the construction or |
---|
| 27 | + | expansion of the facility or field. If area hotel revenue |
---|
| 28 | + | attributable to sporting events held at the facility or field is |
---|
| 29 | + | less than the projected amount, the municipality shall, as soon as |
---|
| 30 | + | practicable, develop and implement a plan to increase that revenue. |
---|
| 31 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4187 was passed by the House on May 9, |
---|
32 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 5, 2 present, not |
---|
33 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
34 | | - | No. 4187 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 20, |
---|
35 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4187 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
39 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays |
---|
40 | | - | 4. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
43 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Date |
---|
45 | | - | __________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 36 | + | * * * * * |
---|