Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|