House | 04/28/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Filed |