Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill May 6, 2017