Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4291 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Schubert (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 4291
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 17, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the fees charged by the Colorado County Groundwater
 Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 8824.151, Special
 District Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8824.151.  DISTRICT REVENUE AND FEES.
 SECTION 2.  Section 8824.151(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To accomplish the regulatory goals of the district, pay
 the maintenance and operating costs of the district, and [to] pay
 any bonds or notes issued by the district, the district may:
 (1)  impose ad valorem taxes at a rate not to exceed
 three cents on each $100 of assessed valuation of taxable property
 in the district; [or]
 (2)  assess production fees as authorized by Section
 36.205, Water Code;
 (3)  solicit and accept grants from any public or
 private source;
 (4)  assess an export fee on water [reasonable fees
 for:
 [(A)  services provided;
 [(B)     water withdrawn from each well that is not
 exempt from district permitting or regulation; or
 [(C)  groundwater] exported from the district in
 an amount not to exceed 150 percent of the maximum wholesale water
 rate charged by the City of Houston; and
 (5)  assess other fees authorized under Chapter 36,
 Water Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *