House | 05/05/2017 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Filed |