Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4329 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2017

                            By: Workman (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 4329
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 19, 2017;
 May 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Travis County Municipal Utility
 District No. 3 to enter into certain agreements relating to the ad
 valorem taxation of certain property located in the district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 8395, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8395.102 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8395.102.  TAXPAYER AGREEMENTS. (a) The district and
 an owner of property that is located in the district and exempt from
 ad valorem taxation by the district may enter into an agreement to
 allow the district to tax that property, subject to the provisions
 of this section.
 (b)  The agreement must be filed with the chief appraiser of
 the Travis County Appraisal District not later than December 31 of
 the tax year preceding the first tax year for which the agreement is
 effective. The agreement is effective until the earlier of:
 (1)  the date on which the agreement expires under the
 terms of the agreement; or
 (2)  the date on which the property described by the
 agreement is no longer entitled to exemption from ad valorem
 taxation.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other law, on receipt of an
 agreement under this section, the chief appraiser shall, beginning
 on January 1 of the first tax year following the year in which the
 agreement is filed and for each subsequent tax year for which the
 agreement is effective:
 (1)  consider the property that is the subject of the
 agreement to be taxable by the district, but not by any other taxing
 unit; and
 (2)  take all necessary steps to ensure the property
 that is the subject of the agreement is listed as property that is
 taxable by the district, but not by any other taxing unit, on the
 appraisal roll that is certified by the chief appraiser to the
 district's assessor under Section 26.01, Tax Code.
 (d)  In this section, "taxing unit" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 1.04, Tax Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *