Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 28, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2017
Bill May 16, 2017