Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#322
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1451
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 400
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 400
|
House
|
11/22/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|