Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB451 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Moody, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 451
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to waiver of immunity in certain employment discrimination
 actions in connection with a workers' compensation claim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 451, Labor Code, is amended by adding
 Section 451.0025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 451.0025.  WAIVER OF IMMUNITY; PERMISSION FOR FIRST
 RESPONDER TO SUE. (a) In this section, "first responder" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 421.095, Government Code.
 (b)  A first responder who alleges a violation of Section
 451.001 by a state or local governmental entity that employs the
 first responder may sue the governmental entity for the relief
 provided by this chapter. Sovereign or governmental immunity from
 suit is waived and abolished to the extent of liability created by
 this chapter.
 (c)  To the extent a person has official or individual
 immunity from a claim for damages, this section does not affect that
 immunity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.002, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The following provisions of Subtitles A and B apply to
 and are included in this chapter except to the extent that they are
 inconsistent with this chapter:
 (1)  Chapter 401, other than Section 401.011(18)
 defining "employer" and Section 401.012 defining "employee";
 (2)  Chapter 402;
 (3)  Chapter 403, other than Sections 403.001-403.005;
 (4)  Chapters 404 and 405;
 (5)  Sections 406.006-406.009 and Subchapters B and
 D-G, Chapter 406, other than Sections 406.033, 406.034, 406.035,
 406.091, and 406.096;
 (6)  Chapter 408, other than Sections 408.001(b) and
 (c);
 (7)  Chapters 409-412;
 (8)  Chapter 413, except as provided by Section
 504.053;
 (9)  Chapters 414-417; and
 (10)  Chapter 451, subject to the limitations of
 Subsection (a-1).
 (a-1)  The liability of a political subdivision under
 Chapter 451 is limited to money damages in a maximum amount of
 $100,000 for each person aggrieved by and $300,000 for each single
 occurrence of a violation of that chapter.  For purposes of this
 subsection, a single occurrence is considered to be a single
 employment policy or employment action that results in
 discrimination against or discharge of one or more employees
 concurrently.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the cause of
 action accrued, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *