Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB455 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Metcalf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 455
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 2, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 13, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 2, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a property owner to participate by
 telephone conference call at a protest hearing by an appraisal
 review board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.45, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsections (b) and (n) and adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and
 (b-3) to read as follows:
 (b)  A [The] property owner initiating a [the] protest is
 entitled to [an opportunity to] appear to offer evidence or
 argument.  A [The] property owner may offer [his] evidence or
 argument by affidavit without personally appearing and may appear
 by telephone conference call to offer argument. A property owner
 who appears by telephone conference call must offer any evidence by
 affidavit.  A property owner must submit an affidavit described by
 this subsection [if he attests to the affidavit before an officer
 authorized to administer oaths and submits the affidavit] to the
 board hearing the protest before the board [it] begins the hearing
 on the protest. On receipt of an affidavit, the board shall notify
 the chief appraiser. The chief appraiser may inspect the affidavit
 and is entitled to a copy on request.
 (b-1)  An appraisal review board shall conduct a hearing on a
 protest by telephone conference call if:
 (1)  the property owner notifies the board that the
 property owner intends to appear by telephone conference call in
 the owner's notice of protest or by written notice filed with the
 board not later than the 10th day before the date of the hearing; or
 (2)  the board proposes that the hearing be conducted
 by telephone conference call and the property owner agrees to the
 hearing being conducted in that manner.
 (b-2)  If a property owner elects to have a hearing on a
 protest conducted by telephone conference call, the appraisal
 review board shall:
 (1)  provide a telephone number for the property owner
 to call to participate in the hearing; and
 (2)  hold the hearing in a location equipped with
 telephone equipment that allows each board member and the other
 parties to the protest who are present at the hearing to hear the
 property owner offer argument.
 (b-3)  A property owner is responsible for providing access
 to a hearing on a protest conducted by telephone conference call to
 another person that the owner invites to participate in the
 hearing.
 (n)  A property owner does not waive the right to appear in
 person at a [the] protest hearing by submitting an affidavit to the
 appraisal review board or by electing to appear by telephone
 conference call.  The board may consider an [the] affidavit
 submitted under this section only if the property owner does not
 appear in person at the [protest] hearing [in person].  For purposes
 of scheduling the hearing, the property owner must [shall] state in
 the affidavit that the property owner does not intend to appear at
 the hearing or that the property owner intends to appear at the
 hearing in person or by telephone conference call and that the
 affidavit may be used only if the property owner does not appear at
 the hearing in person.  If the property owner does not state in the
 affidavit whether the owner intends to appear at the hearing and has
 not elected to appear by telephone conference call, the board shall
 consider the submission of the affidavit as an indication that the
 property owner does not intend to appear at the hearing.  If the
 property owner states in the affidavit that the owner does not
 intend to appear at the hearing or does not state in the affidavit
 whether the owner intends to appear at the hearing and has not
 elected to appear by telephone conference call, the [appraisal
 review] board is not required to consider the affidavit at the
 scheduled hearing and may consider the affidavit at a hearing
 designated for the specific purpose of processing affidavits.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a protest under Chapter 41, Tax Code, for which a notice of protest
 is filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *