LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB457
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB457
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB457
Compare Versions
HB457 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB457 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB457 Enrolled May 28, 2017
HB457 Comm Sub May 22, 2017
HB457 Engrossed April 17, 2017
HB457 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
HB457 Introduced November 29, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
HB457 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB457 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB457 Enrolled May 28, 2017
HB457 Comm Sub May 22, 2017
HB457 Engrossed April 17, 2017
HB457 Comm Sub March 20, 2017
HB457 Introduced November 29, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare