Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1342 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1957 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#467 | Journal Page: 1956 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1956 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1956 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 347 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 347 | |
House | 11/30/2016 | Filed |