Senate | 04/26/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1296 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1820 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | RV#388 | Journal Page: 1819 |
House | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1819 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1819 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Amended | 1-K. King | Journal Page: 1793 |
House | 04/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 12/01/2016 | Filed |