Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#659 | Journal Page: 2340 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2275 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Record vote | RV#612 | Journal Page: 2274 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2274 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Amendment tabled | 2-Leach | Journal Page: 2273 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Amended | 1-Schofield | Journal Page: 2273 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2273 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 1463 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Point of order sustained | Rule 8, Section 1 | Journal Page: 1461 |
House | 04/12/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1461 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Postponed | 4/12/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1445 |
House | 04/11/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1(b) | Journal Page: 1444 |
House | 04/11/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1444 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1442 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 12/02/2016 | Filed |