Senate | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1258 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1552 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | RV#267 | Journal Page: 1552 |
House | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1552 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1552 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Record vote | RV#259 | Journal Page: 1522 |
House | 04/17/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1522 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1522 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 12/05/2016 | Filed |