House | 05/08/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2925 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 500 | Journal Page: 2924 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Postponed | 5/8/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2608 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2608 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Postponed | 5/4/17 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2217 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2217 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 349 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 349 | |
House | 01/25/2017 | Filed |