E
|
06/06/2017
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
January 8, 2019
|
|
E
|
06/06/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5731
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1972
|
Journal Page: 5730
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5726
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3839
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4581
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4581
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4581
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4360
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1640
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#663
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
5-Bell
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-Cain
|
Journal Page: 2346
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Cain
|
Journal Page: 2345
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2344
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/3/17 12:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
6-Cain
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Amended
|
5-Cain
|
Journal Page: 2232
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/2/17 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
|
|
Journal Page: 400
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 400
|
House
|
01/25/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|