Senate | 05/19/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 562 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 750 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Record vote | RV#89 | Journal Page: 706 |
House | 03/16/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 706 | |
House | 03/16/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 706 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 662 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 662 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 612 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 12/06/2016 | Filed |