House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2039
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2039
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2039
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffines
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2038
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#560
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 350
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 350
|
House
|
12/06/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|