House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 866 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 350 | |
House | 12/07/2016 | Filed |