Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1161 | Journal Page: 3265 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3265 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3265 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3222 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amended | 2-Minjarez | Journal Page: 3221 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3220 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 525 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 525 | |
House | 12/07/2016 | Filed |