House | 05/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2885 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Referred directly to s/c on Bond Indebtedness by chair | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 12/07/2016 | Filed |