Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2668
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2667
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#839
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Motion to reconsider spread on the Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2640
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#754
|
Journal Page: 2542
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 2542
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2542
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#692
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2388
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Guillen
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 365
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 365
|
House
|
12/08/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|