E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5869
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#2017
|
Journal Page: 5869
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5867
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2610
|
Journal Page: 5866
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4126
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 929
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3849
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3588
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3587
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4599
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4599
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4599
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4363
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2529
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
12/09/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|