E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4925
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1837
|
Journal Page: 4925
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4925
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#591
|
Journal Page: 2204
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2204
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2204
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 276
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 276
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|