E
|
06/06/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/06/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4135
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1518
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3887
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Taylor of Galveston
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 562
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 750
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#90
|
Journal Page: 708
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 707
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Krause
|
Journal Page: 707
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 707
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 684
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#86
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Amended
|
17-Krause and Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 683
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Motion to table fails
|
16-Gooden
|
Journal Page: 682
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
16-Gooden
|
Journal Page: 681
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
15-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 681
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
10-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 674
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 1, Section 9(b) and Rule 4, Section 33
|
Journal Page: 664
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 276
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 276
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|