Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB626 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Workman, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 626
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to late applications for certain exemptions from ad
 valorem taxation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.431, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 11.431.  LATE APPLICATION FOR HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION. (a)
 The chief appraiser shall accept and approve or deny an application
 for a residence homestead exemption, including an exemption under
 Section 11.131 or 11.132 for the residence homestead of a disabled
 veteran or the surviving spouse of a disabled veteran or an
 exemption under Section 11.133 for the residence homestead of the
 surviving spouse of a member of the armed services of the United
 States who is killed in action, after the deadline for filing it has
 passed if it is filed not later than two years [one year] after the
 delinquency date for the taxes on the homestead.
 (b)  If a late application is approved after approval of the
 appraisal records by the appraisal review board, the chief
 appraiser shall notify the collector for each unit in which the
 residence is located not later than the 30th day after the date the
 late application is approved.  The collector shall deduct from the
 person's tax bill the amount of tax imposed on the exempted amount
 if the tax has not been paid.  If the tax has been paid, the
 collector shall refund the amount of tax imposed on the exempted
 amount.  The collector shall pay the refund not later than the 60th
 day after the date the chief appraiser notifies the collector of the
 approval of the exemption.  A person is not required to apply for a
 refund under this subsection to receive the refund.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.439, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 11.439.  LATE APPLICATION FOR DISABLED VETERANS
 EXEMPTION. (a)  The chief appraiser shall accept and approve or
 deny an application for an exemption under Section 11.22 after the
 filing deadline provided by Section 11.43 if the application is
 filed not later than five years [one year] after the delinquency
 date for the taxes on the property.
 (b)  If a late application is approved after approval of the
 appraisal records for the year for which the exemption is granted,
 the chief appraiser shall notify the collector for each taxing unit
 in which the property was taxable in that year not later than the
 30th day after the date the late application is approved.  The
 collector shall correct the taxing unit's tax roll to reflect the
 amount of tax imposed on the property after applying the exemption
 and shall deduct from the person's tax bill the amount of tax
 imposed on the exempted portion of the property for that year.  If
 the tax and any related penalties and interest have been paid, the
 collector shall pay to the person a refund of the tax imposed on the
 exempted portion of the property and the corresponding portion of
 any related penalties and interest paid.  The collector shall pay
 the refund not later than the 60th day after the date the chief
 appraiser notifies the collector of the approval of the exemption.
 [No additional interest is due on the amount refunded.]
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 11.431 and 11.439, Tax Code, apply only to an application for an
 exemption filed under Section 11.431 or 11.439, Tax Code, for the
 2016 tax year or a later tax year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *