E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3887
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#884
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2666
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 2666
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2666
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 417
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 417
|
House
|
12/19/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|