LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB658
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB658
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB658
Compare Versions
HB658 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB658 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB658 Enrolled May 25, 2017
HB658 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB658 Engrossed May 9, 2017
HB658 Comm Sub May 6, 2017
HB658 Introduced December 21, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
HB658 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB658 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB658 Enrolled May 25, 2017
HB658 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB658 Engrossed May 9, 2017
HB658 Comm Sub May 6, 2017
HB658 Introduced December 21, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare