Senate | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2069 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1918 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3492 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Record vote | RV#1233 | Journal Page: 3422 |
House | 05/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3422 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3422 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3353 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3353 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 469 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 469 | |
House | 12/20/2016 | Filed |