Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2320 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#635 | Journal Page: 2320 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2320 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2320 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2235 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2235 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Amended | 1-Canales | Journal Page: 2234 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2234 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 526 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 526 | |
House | 12/20/2016 | Filed |