Senate | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1257 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1257 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1010 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Record vote | RV#243 | Journal Page: 1493 |
House | 04/13/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1493 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1493 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 276 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 276 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |