House
|
05/09/2017
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 160
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
House
|
12/21/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|