House | 05/09/2017 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 3098 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Point of order sustained | Rule 8, Section 1(c) | Journal Page: 3096 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3096 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2979 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2979 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 12/22/2016 | Filed |