Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1605 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1605 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1361 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#548 | Journal Page: 2106 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2106 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2106 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 12/27/2016 | Filed |