House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#501 | Journal Page: 2031 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Tinderholt, Cain, and Biedermann | Journal Page: 2030 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2030 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 12/27/2016 | Filed |