Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 562 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 726 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 661 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Record vote | RV#73 | Journal Page: 661 |
House | 03/15/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 661 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 661 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Record vote | RV#69 | Journal Page: 647 |
House | 03/14/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 647 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Amended | 3-Meyer | Journal Page: 646 |
House | 03/14/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Meyer | Journal Page: 646 |
House | 03/14/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 646 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 612 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
House | 12/27/2016 | Filed |