House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3377 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1201 | Journal Page: 3376 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Postponed | 5/12/17 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3376 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3376 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Postponed | 5/11/17 10:00 PM | Journal Page: 3224 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3224 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 372 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 372 | |
House | 01/02/2017 | Filed |