Senate | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1770 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3120 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1087 | Journal Page: 3119 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3119 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3119 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2998 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Amended | 1-Parker | Journal Page: 2997 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2997 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Postponed | 5/8/17 6:25 PM | Journal Page: 2994 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1843 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 02/23/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 01/02/2017 | Filed |