LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB791
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB791
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB791
Compare Versions
HB791 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB791 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB791 Enrolled May 21, 2017
HB791 Comm Sub May 10, 2017
HB791 Engrossed April 13, 2017
HB791 Introduced January 2, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB791 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB791 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB791 Enrolled May 21, 2017
HB791 Comm Sub May 10, 2017
HB791 Engrossed April 13, 2017
HB791 Introduced January 2, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare