E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6061
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5625
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1948
|
Journal Page: 5626
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5625
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5625
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5462
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5462
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5462
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3073
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 3065
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3065
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3065
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2070
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1296
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#390
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Amended
|
4-Elkins
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
|
|
Journal Page: 619
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 619
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|