House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 389 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 389 | |
House | 01/03/2017 | Filed |