E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1973
|
Journal Page: 5735
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5734
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5731
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3839
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3588
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3588
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5190
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5190
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5190
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4816
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Taylor of Collin
|
Journal Page: 2978
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2978
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2978
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1242
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3376
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Parker, Allen, Alonzo, Alvarado, Anchia, C. Anderson, R. Anderson, Arvalo, Ashby, Bailes, More
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
House
|
01/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|