Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1162 | Journal Page: 3266 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3222 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3222 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3222 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 390 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 390 | |
House | 01/04/2017 | Filed |